EP0329430 - Position detecting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.1993 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.1993 [1993/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsugu, Masakazu Canon-ryo 2-6-29 Mizuhiki Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Saitoh, Kenji 1-30-40-132 Higashiterao Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Suda, Shigeyuki 1-30-40-333 Higashiterao Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Kuroda, Ryo Canon-ryo 2-10-1 Asahicho Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Niwa, Yukichi 2-3-3-501 Akitsu Narashino-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 06 /
Nose, Noriyuki Tadao-Sentoralu Manshon 1-28-8-203 Tadao Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | [1989/34] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89301470.4 | 16.02.1989 | [1989/34] | Priority number, date | JP19880033204 | 16.02.1988 Original published format: JP 3320488 | [1989/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0329430 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0329430 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0329430 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/14, G01B11/27, G03B41/00 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
G03F9/7023 (EP,US);
G03F9/7049 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/34] | G01B11/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/34] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Lagefeststellung | [1989/34] | English: | Position detecting device | [1989/34] | French: | Dispositif de détection de position | [1989/34] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 19.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4037969 (FELDMAN MARTIN, et al); | [A]US4211489 (BOSENBERG WOLFRAM A [US], et al); | [A]US4340305 (SMITH HENRY I, et al); | [A]US4360273 (THAXTER JAMES B); | [A]US4631416 (TRUTNA JR WILLIAM R [US]) |