EP0330442 - Method for processing photographic colour materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/35] | Method and apparatus for processing photographic colour materials | ||
[1996/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
FR
Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | For:GB
Kodak Limited P.O. Box 66 Station Road Hemel Hempstead Herts, HP1 1JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For:DE
FR
Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
For:GB
KODAK LIMITED P.O. Box 66 Station Road Hemel Hempstead Herts, HP1 1JU / GB | |||
Former [1996/03] | For:DE
FR
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
For:GB
KODAK LIMITED P.O. Box 66 Station Road Hemel Hempstead Herts, HP1 1JU / GB | |||
Former [1989/35] | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
For:GB
KODAK LIMITED P.O. Box 66 Station Road Hemel Hempstead Herts, HP1 1JU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marsden, Peter D. 49 Southfield Park North Harrow Middlesex HA2 6HF / GB | 02 /
Fyson, John R. "Tortworth" 8 Meynell crescent Hackney London E9 7AS / GB | 03 /
Twist, Peter J. "Woodside" Lee Common Gt Missenden Bucks HP16 9NE / GB | [1989/35] | Representative(s) | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1989/35] | Baron, Paul Alexander Clifford, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 89301703.8 | 22.02.1989 | [1989/35] | Priority number, date | GB19880004606 | 26.02.1988 Original published format: GB 8804606 | [1989/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0330442 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0330442 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0330442 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/30 | [1989/35] | CPC: |
G03C7/407 (EP,US);
G03C7/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/02] |
Former [1989/35] | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verarbeiten farbphotographischer Materialien | [1996/22] | English: | Method for processing photographic colour materials | [1996/22] | French: | Procédé de traitement de produits photographiques en couleurs | [1996/22] |
Former [1989/35] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verarbeiten farbphotographischer Materialien | ||
Former [1989/35] | Method and apparatus for processing photographic colour materials | ||
Former [1989/35] | Procédé et appareil de traitement de produits photographiques couleur | Examination procedure | 10.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 08.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0147148 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]); | [Y]EP0246624 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [YD]JPH06252549 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) | Examination | WO8704534 | EP0330035 | - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, vol. A20, 5th ed. 1992, pp. 84 and 85 | - British Journal of Photography, 1974, pp. 597 and 598 |