EP0330462 - An improved rice hull ash concrete admixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.1994 [1994/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN. Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10036 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York, New York 10036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kindt, Lawrence Joseph 7110 Old Washington Road Woodbine Maryland 21797 / US | 02 /
Gartner, Ellis Martin 1105 Tanley Road Silver Spring Maryland 20904 / US | [1989/35] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Stephen, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Bentham, Stephen, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1989/35] | Bentham, Stephen J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 89301757.4 | 23.02.1989 | [1989/35] | Priority number, date | US19880159978 | 24.02.1988 Original published format: US 159978 | [1989/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0330462 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0330462 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C04B18/10, C04B28/02, // (C04B28/02, 18:10, 24:16),(C04B28/02, 18:10, 24:26) | [1989/35] | CPC: |
C04B18/101 (EP,US);
C04B18/06 (KR);
Y02W30/91 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/35] | Title | German: | Reisschalen-Asche enthaltende Betonmischung | [1989/35] | English: | An improved rice hull ash concrete admixture | [1989/35] | French: | Mélange de béton à cendres de balles de riz | [1989/35] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 11.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 01.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/50] | 15.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/50] | Request for further processing for: | 04.01.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 04.01.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.03.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | SA7805815 [ ]; | [Y]FR1587389 ; | [Y]GB2131409 (ELKEM AS [NO]); | [A]FR2621036 (BOUYGUES SA [FR]); | [A]US4659679 (FALK RICHARD A [US]); | [A]GB2044241 (GRACE W R & CO) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 94, no. 12, march 1981, page 335, abstract no. 89207j, Columbus, Ohio, US; & SA-A-78 05 815 (B.T. KEOGH) 26-03-1980, & SA7805815 A 00000000 |