EP0331464 - Method of refolding urokinase precursor-like protein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.1993 [1993/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746 / JP | ||
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Oaza Tonda Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honma, Nobuyuki 35-21, Sakuradai Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Hanzawa, Satoshi 2-7-3, Tachibanadai Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1989/36] | Representative(s) | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 89302042.0 | 01.03.1989 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | JP19880047584 | 02.03.1988 Original published format: JP 4758488 | [1989/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0331464 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0331464 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07K3/08, C12P21/02, // C12N9/72 | [1989/36] | CPC: |
C12N9/6462 (EP);
C07K1/1133 (EP);
C07K1/1136 (EP);
C12Y304/21073 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/36] | Title | German: | Methode zur Rückfaltung von urokinase-precursorähnlichem Protein | [1989/36] | English: | Method of refolding urokinase precursor-like protein | [1989/36] | French: | Méthode de pliage de la protéine similaire au précurseur de l'urokinase | [1989/36] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 16.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/42] | 04.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0122080 |