EP0333428 - Cylindrical device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.1990 [1990/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McLeish, Alexander Ogilvie Viewfield Barry Angus Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/38] | For all designated states McLeish, Alexander Ogilvie Viewfield Barry Angus Scotland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/38] | Representative(s) | Jones, Andree Zena, et al CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/38] | Jones, Andrée Zena, et al CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 89302492.7 | 14.03.1989 | [1989/38] | Priority number, date | GB19880006065 | 15.03.1988 Original published format: GB 8806065 | [1989/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0333428 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G09B1/20, G09B1/14, A63F9/08 | [1989/38] | CPC: |
A63F9/0811 (EP);
A63F9/083 (EP);
G09B1/14 (EP);
G09B1/20 (EP);
A63F2009/0815 (EP);
A63F2250/186 (EP);
A63F2250/285 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1989/38] | Title | German: | Zylindrische Vorrichtung | [1989/38] | English: | Cylindrical device | [1989/38] | French: | Dispositif cylindrique | [1989/38] | File destroyed: | 29.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.03.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/44] | 12.06.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3227117 ; | [X]WO8200101 ; | [X]CA1199351 ; | [X]GB2107997 ; | [A]EP0113705 ; | [A]DE3309674 |