EP0387435 - Control arrangement for a switched mode power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.12.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Farnell Instruments Limited Sandbeck Way Wetherby West Yorkshire LS22 4DH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | For all designated states FARNELL INSTRUMENTS LIMITED Sandbeck Way Wetherby West Yorkshire LS22 4DH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shires, Jonathan Littlebeck Old Mill Lane Clifford Wetherby West Yorkshire LS23 6LE / GB | 02 /
Turner, John 6 Deighton Road Wetherby West Yorkshire LS22 4TE / GB | [1990/38] | Representative(s) | Denmark, James Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | Denmark, James Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB | ||
Former [1990/38] | Wayte, Dennis Travers BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89302586.6 | 16.03.1989 | [1990/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0387435 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/00, H02M3/156 | [1990/38] | CPC: |
H02M1/4225 (EP,US);
H02M3/156 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/38] | Title | German: | Antriebsanordnung für ein Schaltnetzteil | [1990/38] | English: | Control arrangement for a switched mode power supply | [1990/38] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'une alimentation à découpage | [1990/38] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 01.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/04] | 09.09.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3310774 (ZUMTOBEL AG [AT]); | [A]US4677366 (WILKINSON BRUCE L [US], et al) | [A] - PESC'86 RECORD, 17th ANNUAL IEEE POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONF. 1986, pages 531 - 540; C.P. HENZE et al: "A digitally controlled AC to DC power conditioner that draws sinusoïdal input current" |