EP0336590 - Idler wheel assembly for a track-laying vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1993 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.1993 [1993/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 Northeast Adams Street Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oertley, Thomas Earl 1528 West Timberdale Drive Dunlap Illinois 61525 / US | [1989/41] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89302651.8 | 17.03.1989 | [1989/41] | Priority number, date | US19880177275 | 04.04.1988 Original published format: US 177275 | [1989/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0336590 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0336590 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0336590 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/14, B62D55/096 | [1989/41] | CPC: |
B62D55/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/41] | Title | German: | Umlenkrad-Zusammenbau für ein Kettenfahrzeug | [1989/41] | English: | Idler wheel assembly for a track-laying vehicle | [1989/41] | French: | Assemblage de roue de renvoi pour véhicule à chenille | [1989/41] | Examination procedure | 12.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 06.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | FR   M01   Not yet paid | GB   M01   Not yet paid | IT   M01   Not yet paid | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3135126 (MILITANA FRANK A); | [A]US3504562 (HIRYCH EDWARD); | [A]GB674799 (HARRY NOBLET); | [A]DE1150583 (HUGO CORDES DIPL ING) |