EP0334601 - Error detecting device for optical head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.1995 [1995/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746 / JP | ||
Former [1989/39] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Oaza Tonda Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukui, Kenji 9-2-503,Shonandai 2-chome Fujisama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kawai, Akira 35-21,Sakuradai,Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1989/39] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89302790.4 | 21.03.1989 | [1989/39] | Priority number, date | JP19880069867 | 25.03.1988 Original published format: JP 6986788 | JP19880089268 | 13.04.1988 Original published format: JP 8926888 | JP19880156852 | 27.06.1988 Original published format: JP 15685288 | [1989/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0334601 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0334601 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0334601 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09 | [1989/39] | CPC: |
G11B7/0909 (EP,US);
G11B7/1378 (EP,US);
G11B2007/13722 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/39] | Title | German: | Fehlerdetektorvorrichtung für einen optischen Abtastkopf | [1989/39] | English: | Error detecting device for optical head | [1989/39] | French: | Dispositif détecteur d'erreurs pour tête optique | [1989/39] | Examination procedure | 18.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 28.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6093643 ; | [A]JP5933637 ; | [X]EP0180767 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [X]DE2445333 (PHILIPS NV); | [XP]EP0283002 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0084703 (MAGNETIC PERIPHERALS INC [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 239 (P-391)(1962) 25 August 1985, & JP-A-60 93643 (TOSHIBA K.K.) 25 May 1985,, & JP6093643 A 19850525 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 129 (P-280)(1566) 15 June 1984, & JP-A-59 33637 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K) 23 February 1984,, & JP5933637 A 19840223 |