EP0336616 - Compatible optical disk [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Utsumi, Kenichi 5-28-11-101, Sagamigaoka Zama-shi Kanagawa 228 / JP | 02 /
Koshino, Nagaaki Kureru Kibogaoka -302, 1013-1 Higashi-Kibogaoka Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 241 / JP | 03 /
Goto, Yasuyuki 1-13-10, Morinosato Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-01 / JP | 04 /
Tsugawa, Iwao 616-2 Kanamori Machida-shi Tokyo 194 / JP | 05 /
Nakada, Masahiro 2-3-10 Sakae-cho Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243 / JP | [1989/41] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89302942.1 | 23.03.1989 | [1989/41] | Priority number, date | JP19880085161 | 08.04.1988 Original published format: JP 8516188 | [1989/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0336616 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0336616 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0336616 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/007, G11B7/09 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
G11B7/243 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/0938 (EP,US);
G11B7/24 (EP,US);
G11B2007/2431 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24314 (EP,US);
G11B7/2585 (EP,US);
G11B7/2595 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/41] | G11B7/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/41] | Title | German: | Kompatible optische Platte | [1994/19] | English: | Compatible optical disk | [1989/41] | French: | Disque optique compatible | [1989/41] |
Former [1989/41] | Kompatible optische Scheibe | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 24.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57024038 ; | [A]JP60177446 ; | [Y]EP0132137 | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 25, no. 1, June 1982, NEW YORK US page 440 WIEDER: "Enhanced Reflectivity Rings For Optical Recording Track Servoing" | [A] - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. vol. 54, no. 9, September 1983, NEW YORK US pages 5376 - 5380; TAKENAGA ET AL.: "TeOx Thin Films For An Optical Disc Memory" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 88 (P-118) 26 May 1982, & JP-A-57 024038 (SONY CORP) 08 February 1982,, & JP57024038 A 19820208 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 26 (P-425)(2083) 31 January 1986, & JP-A-60 177446 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) 11 September 1985,, & JP60177446 A 19850911 |