EP0388543 - Modified adhesive composition which undergoes color change upon application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.1993 [1993/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONROS CORPORATION 1190 Birchmount Road Scarborough Ontario M1P 2B8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | For all designated states CONROS CORPORATION 1190 Birchmount Road Scarborough Ontario M1P 2B8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chandaria, Ashok Kumar Conros Corporation 1190 Birchmount Road Scarborough Ontario M1P 2B8 / CA | [1990/39] | Representative(s) | Lawson, David Glynne, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [1990/39] | Application number, filing date | 89302971.0 | 23.03.1989 | [1990/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0388543 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C09J139/06, C09J11/06, C09J9/00 | [1990/39] | CPC: |
C08K5/1535 (EP,US);
C09J139/06 (EP,US);
C09J9/005 (EP,US);
C08L2666/28 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/1535, C08L39/06 (EP,US);
C09J139/06, C08L2666/28 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/39] | Title | German: | Modifizierte Klebstoffmasse, die während ihrer Anwendung eine Farbveränderung aufweist | [1990/39] | English: | Modified adhesive composition which undergoes color change upon application | [1990/39] | French: | Composition adhésive modifiée présentant un changement de couleur lors de son application | [1990/39] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 09.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/02] | 19.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2445715 (PELIKAN WERKE WAGNER GUENTHER); | [A]US3964832 (COHEN NORMAN B, et al); | [A]DE1811466 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH) |