Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR890014799 | 25.10.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP7377988 | 28.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0335622 | Global Dossier | 15.03.1995 | B1 | EP0335622 | 23.10.1991 | A3 | EP0335622 | 04.10.1989 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP7377988 | 28.03.1988 | JP4977989 | 03.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE68921658T | 30.11.1995 | T2 | DE68921658D1 | 20.04.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP7377988 | 28.03.1988 | JP4977989 | 03.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0742615B | 10.05.1995 | B2 | JPH026623 | 10.01.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP7377988 | 28.03.1988 | JP4977989 | 03.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW206990B | 01.06.1993 | B | Priority number | Date | JP7377988 | 28.03.1988 | JP4977989 | 03.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5114697 | 19.05.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP7377988 | 28.03.1988 | JP4977989 | 03.03.1989 |