EP0335660 - Heat-resistant insulating substrate, thermal printing head, and thermographic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.07.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1996 | Revocation of patent | published on 11.09.1996 [1996/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Homma, Katsuhisa c/o Patent Division 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nikaido, Masaru c/o Patent Division 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ouchi, Yoshiaki c/o Patent Division 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Yamazaki, Mutsuki c/o Patent Division 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Yoshizawa, Shuji 1-12-12, Nighiogi-Minami Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/40] | Representative(s) | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | ||
Former [1989/40] | Sturt, Clifford Mark MARKS & CLERK 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303052.8 | 28.03.1989 | [1989/40] | Priority number, date | JP19880074241 | 28.03.1988 Original published format: JP 7424188 | JP19880227524 | 13.09.1988 Original published format: JP 22752488 | [1989/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0335660 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0335660 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0335660 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/14, B41J2/315, H01L49/02 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
H01L23/145 (EP,US);
B41J2/3353 (EP,US);
B41J2/3355 (EP,US);
B41J2/3359 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/40] | H01L23/14, B41J3/20, H01L49/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/40] | Title | German: | Wärmebeständiges, isolierendes Substrat, thermischer Druckkopf und thermografischer Apparat | [1989/40] | English: | Heat-resistant insulating substrate, thermal printing head, and thermographic apparatus | [1989/40] | French: | Substrat isolant résistant à la chaleur, tête d'impression thermique et appareil de thermographie | [1989/40] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/40] | 29.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 18.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.06.1994
17.06.1994
ADMISSIBLE HI-TEC Electronik Vertriebs GmbH Räterstr. 24/26 D-85551 Kirchheim / DE Opponent's representative Fechner, Joachim Im Broeltal 118 53773 Hennef / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.06.1994
17.06.1994
ADMISSIBLE HI-TEC Electronik Vertriebs GmbH Räterstr. 24/26 D-85551 Kirchheim / DE Opponent's representative Fechner, Joachim, Dr.-Ing. Im Broeltal 118 D-53773 Hennef / DE | 13.07.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.10.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.02.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.02.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/37] | 14.03.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP63297066 ; | [A]EP0202877 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) | Examination | JPS62117760 |