EP0334684 - A method for heat-treating gallium arsenide monocrystals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1993 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.1993 [1993/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI COMPANY LIMITED 4-2, Marunouchi 1-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI COMPANY LIMITED 4-2, Marunouchi 1-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitigawara, Yutaka 139-7, Fujizuka-cho Takasaki-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Kuwahara, Susumu 4-3-22, Isobe Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Takenaka, Takao 1673-1, Hiraichi Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | [1989/39] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | Whalley, Kevin, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303058.5 | 28.03.1989 | [1989/39] | Priority number, date | JP19880069733 | 25.03.1988 Original published format: JP 6973388 | [1989/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0334684 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0334684 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C30B33/00, C30B29/42 | [1989/39] | CPC: |
C30B33/00 (EP);
C30B29/42 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C30B33/00, C30B29/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur thermischen Behandlung von Galliumarsenid-Einkristallen | [1989/39] | English: | A method for heat-treating gallium arsenide monocrystals | [1989/39] | French: | Procédé de traitement de recuit pour monocristaux d'arséniure de gallium | [1989/39] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 13.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6221800 ; | [A]JP6270300 ; | [A]JP62162700 ; | [A]EP0176130 | [A] - JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, vol. 76, no. 2, August 1986, pages 217-232, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V., Amsterdam, NL; S. McGUIGAN et al.: "Growth and properties of large-diameter indium lattice-hardened GaAs crystals" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 200 (C-431)[2647], 27th June 1987; & JP-A-62 21 800 (NIPPON TELEGR. & TELEPH. CORP.) 30-01-1987, & JP6221800 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 267 (C-443)[2714], 28th August 1987; & JP-A-62 70 300 (TOSHIBA CORP.) 31-03-1987, & JP6270300 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 5 (C-467)[2852], 8th January 1988; & JP-A-62 162 700 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD: THE) 18-07-1987, & JP62162700 A 00000000 |