EP0335668 - Method and catalyst for synthesis gas preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eberly, Paul Earl, Jr. 9440 Ventura Drive Baton Rouge Louisiana 70815 / US | 02 /
Goetsch, Duane Arlen 715 Finchley Avenue Baton Rouge Louisiana 70806 / US | 03 /
Say, Geoffrey Rhys 3020 Tall Timbers Road Baton Rouge Louisiana 70815 / US | 04 /
Vargas, Jose Manuel 8250 Gladewood Drive Baton Rouge Louisiana 70806 / US | [1989/40] | Representative(s) | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 12 Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303063.5 | 28.03.1989 | [1989/40] | Priority number, date | US19880174174 | 28.03.1988 Original published format: US 174174 | [1989/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0335668 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0335668 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0335668 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/44, C01B3/40 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
C01B3/40 (EP);
C01B3/44 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/40] | C01B3/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1989/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Katalysator zur Herstellung von Synthesegas | [1989/40] | English: | Method and catalyst for synthesis gas preparation | [1989/40] | French: | Procédé et catalyseur pour la préparation de gaz de synthèse | [1989/40] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 17.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE1808911 (CHEMICAL CONSTRUCTION CORP); | [A]EP0164864 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]) |