EP0335693 - Capacitative weight sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LYNXVALE LIMITED The Old Schools Trinity Lane Cambridge CB2 1TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states LYNXVALE LIMITED The Old Schools Trinity Lane Cambridge CB2 1TS / GB | ||
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states LYNXVALE LIMITED The Old Schools Cambridge CB2 1TS / GB | ||
Former [1989/40] | For all designated states Cebon, David Queen's College Cambridge CB2 9ET / GB | ||
For all designated states Cole, David James 36 Lawn Road Chelmsford Essex CM1 / GB | |||
For all designated states Hardy, Michael Stuart Anthony Gonville & Caius College Cambridge CB2 1TA / GB | |||
For all designated states Newland, David Edward Ickleton Lodge Ickleton Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1SH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cebon, David Queen's College Cambridge CB2 9ET / GB | 02 /
Cole, David James 36 Lawn Road Chelmsford, Essex / GB | 03 /
Hardy, Michael Stuart Anthony Gonville & Caius College Cambridge CB2 1TA / GB | 04 /
Newland, David Edward Ickleton Lodge Ickleton Saffron Walden, Essex CM10 1SH / GB | [1993/32] |
Former [1991/27] | 01 /
Cebon, David Queen's College Cambridge CB2 9ET / GB | ||
02 /
Cole, David James 36 Lawn Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 / GB | |||
03 /
Hardy, Michael Stuart Anthony Gonville & Caius College Cambridge CB2 1TA / GB | |||
04 /
Newland, David Edward Ickleton Lodge Ickleton Saffron Walden, Essex CM10 1SH / GB | |||
Former [1989/40] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Greene-Kelly, James Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | Greene-Kelly, James Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303112.0 | 29.03.1989 | [1989/40] | Priority number, date | GB19880007798 | 31.03.1988 Original published format: GB 8807798 | [1989/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0335693 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0335693 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0335693 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01G7/06, G01G19/03 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
G01G7/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/40] | G01G7/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/40] | Title | German: | Kapazitiver Gewichtssensor | [1989/40] | English: | Capacitative weight sensor | [1989/40] | French: | Capteur capacitif de pesage | [1989/40] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 15.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 11.08.1993 | [1994/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3678378 (TROTT JOHN JAMES, et al); | [Y]DE2615141 (CHRISTIANSSON PER LENNART); | [A]EP0103360 (WOLFENDALE PETER CALEB FREDERI); | [Y]DE3426165 (METTLER INSTRUMENTE AG [CH]) | [A] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, no. 277, May 1987, pages 318-319, New York, NY, US: "The capactive pad sensor" | [A] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, no. 277, May 1987, page 316, New York, NY, US: "The capacite strip sensor" |