EP0335718 - Method of producing tire reinforcing member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | ||
Former [1989/40] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 1-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Kazunari 4-5-408, Ogawahigashi-Cho 3-Chome Kodaira City Tokyo / JP | [1989/40] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | Whalley, Kevin, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303156.7 | 30.03.1989 | [1989/40] | Priority number, date | JP19880074460 | 30.03.1988 Original published format: JP 7446088 | [1989/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0335718 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0335718 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0335718 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/38 | [1989/40] | CPC: |
B32B37/206 (EP,US);
B29C70/16 (EP,US);
B29C70/20 (EP,US);
B29D30/38 (EP,US);
B32B38/0012 (EP,US);
B29K2021/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | FR [1997/33] |
Former [1989/40] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Reifenverstärkung | [1989/40] | English: | Method of producing tire reinforcing member | [1989/40] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un élément de renforcement de pneu | [1989/40] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 21.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 17.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 15.07.1994 | Appeal received No. T0754/94 | 14.09.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.11.1995 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M03) [1995/47] | 22.12.1995 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1995/51] | 17.03.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 16.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2501126 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG [DE]); | [X]US4452837 (CLAUSEN VICTOR H [US], et al); | [Y]EP0216122 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) |