Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.1992 [1992/50] |
01.11.1991 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] |
22.03.1991 | First examination report | |
10.10.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.11.1989 [1989/48] |
19.08.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.10.1989 [1989/40] |