EP0337652 - Superior catalysts for preparation of 3-amino-2,2,4,4-tetramethylthietane via the Leuckart reaction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | For all designated states PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hay, Bruce Allan 1, High Street Mystic Connecticut / US | [1989/42] | Representative(s) | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303363.9 | 05.04.1989 | [1989/42] | Priority number, date | US19880180511 | 12.04.1988 Original published format: US 180511 | [1989/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0337652 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0337652 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D331/04, B01J21/02, C07C209/24, C07C209/28 | [1992/41] | CPC: |
C07D331/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/42] | C07D331/04, C07C85/08, B01J21/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/42] | Title | German: | Katalysatoren zur Herstellung von 3-amino-2,2,4,4-tetramethyl-thietane via Leuckart Reaktion | [1989/42] | English: | Superior catalysts for preparation of 3-amino-2,2,4,4-tetramethylthietane via the Leuckart reaction | [1989/42] | French: | Catalyseurs p ur la préparation de thietanes 3-amino-2,2,4,4-tétraméthyliques via la réaction de leuckart | [1989/42] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 26.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2007/16] | LU | 30.04.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0034876 (PFIZER [US]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS | [A] - THEILHEIMERS SYNTHETIC METHODS OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY | [Y] - M. FIESER et al.: "Reagents for Organic Synthesis" | [ ] - C. FERRI: "Reaktionen der organischen Synthese" | [ ] - BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 43, no. 20, 25 October 1949, abstract no. 7920g, Columbus, Ohio, USA; J.F. BUNNETT et al.: "Preparation of tertiary amines by the Leuckart reaction"; & J. Am. Chem. Soc. 71, pages 1587-1589, 1949 (Cat. D) | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 42, no. 18, 20 September 1948, abstract no. 6781b, Columbus, Ohio, US; V.J. WEBERS: "The Leuckart reaction: a study of the mechanism"; & J. Am. Chem. Soc. vol. 70, pages 1422-1424, 1948 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 42, no. 20, 20 October 1948, abstract no. 7758d, Columbus, Ohio, US; F. LEONHARD et al.: "2-Thenyl substituted diamines with antihistamic activity", & J. AM. Chem. Soc. 70, pages 2064-2067, 1948 | - THEILHEIMERS SYNTHETIC METHODS OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 41, 1987, page 149, abstract 334, Basel; A. F. FINCH: Oxazolines from 2-aminoalcohols and carboxylic acids"; & J. Chem. Soc. Partkin Trans I, 1985, pages 1865-1869 |