EP0337670 - Signal transmission system for machine tools, inspection machines, and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1992 | Change - withdrawal | published on 22.04.1992 [1992/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | For all designated states Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-Under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collingwood, David The Cottage Wigmore Green Middleyard Kings Stanley Stoneshouse Gloucestershire, GL10 3QD / GB | [1989/42] | Representative(s) | Jackson, John Timothy, et al Renishaw plc Patent Department New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | Jackson, John Timothy, et al Renishaw plc Patent Department New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303439.7 | 07.04.1989 | [1989/42] | Priority number, date | GB19880008612 | 12.04.1988 Original published format: GB 8808612 | [1989/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0337670 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0337670 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G08C23/00, H04B9/00, H04B15/00, H04J15/00 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
G01B21/047 (EP);
G08C19/12 (EP);
G08C23/04 (EP);
G01B2210/58 (EP);
G08C2201/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/42] | G08C23/00, H04B9/00, H04B15/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/42] | Title | German: | Signalübertragungssystem für Werkzeugmaschinen, Inspektionsmaschinen und dergleichen | [1989/42] | English: | Signal transmission system for machine tools, inspection machines, and the like | [1989/42] | French: | Système de transmission pour machines, outils, machines d'inspection et similaires | [1989/42] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 18.02.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1135076 (LEITZ ERNST GMBH); | [Y]FR2333391 (SABA GMBH [DE]); | [Y]GB2109189 (MARCONI CO LTD); | [YD]US4545106 (JUENGEL RICHARD O [US]) | [Y] - LASER FOCUS, vol. 21, no. 3, March 1985, pages 100,102, Littleton, Massachusetts, US; W.V. SUBBARAO: "Simple through-air IR transmitter and receiver" | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 22, no. 1, June 1979, pages 345-346, New York, US; F. GFELLER: "Optical multiplexing of data signals" |