EP0337687 - Quilted elastic composite fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zafiroglu, Dimitri Peter 303 Pentland Drive Greenville Delaware 19807 / US | [1989/42] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303484.3 | 10.04.1989 | [1989/42] | Priority number, date | US19880179620 | 11.04.1988 Original published format: US 179620 | [1989/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0337687 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0337687 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0337687 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D04H13/00 | [1989/42] | CPC: |
D04H1/52 (EP,US);
B32B5/00 (EP,US);
D04H1/4374 (EP,US);
B32B2250/20 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0207 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0261 (EP,US);
B32B2307/304 (EP,US);
B32B2307/3065 (EP,US);
B32B2307/51 (EP,US);
B32B2307/718 (EP,US);
B32B2307/72 (EP,US);
B32B2307/726 (EP,US);
B32B2307/732 (EP,US);
B32B2437/00 (EP,US);
B32B2535/00 (EP,US);
B32B2571/00 (EP,US);
B32B5/022 (EP,US);
B32B5/024 (EP,US);
B32B5/026 (EP,US);
B32B5/06 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, GR, IT [1989/42] | Title | German: | Mehrschichtige, elastische Steppstoffbahn | [1989/42] | English: | Quilted elastic composite fabric | [1989/42] | French: | Etoffe composite élastique piquée | [1989/42] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 10.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 30.06.1993 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0212284 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]); | [A]US4704321 (ZAFIROGLU DIMITRI P [US]); | [A]US4773238 (ZAFIROGLU DIMITRI P [US]) |