EP0337719 - Method of producing thermoplastic resin film and cushioning material using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/42] | Thermoplastic resin film, method of producing same and cushioning material using same | ||
[1993/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JSP CORPORATION 1-1, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8580 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | For all designated states JSP CORPORATION 1-1, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Momose, Yoshiaki 1028-5, Kitayana Hanano-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1989/42] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303547.7 | 11.04.1989 | [1989/42] | Priority number, date | JP19880088244 | 12.04.1988 Original published format: JP 8824488 | JP19880099720 | 22.04.1988 Original published format: JP 9972088 | [1989/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0337719 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0337719 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0337719 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/06, B32B27/08, // B29L7:00, B29L9:00 | [1989/42] | CPC: |
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/11 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
B29C48/307 (EP,US);
B29C48/362 (EP,US);
B29C48/70 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/302 (US);
B32B27/304 (US);
B32B27/306 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B32B27/365 (US);
B32B3/04 (US);
B32B3/18 (EP,US);
B32B37/153 (EP,US);
Y10T428/22 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24074 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24661 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24967 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249924 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2924 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2931 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31725 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31736 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31739 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3175 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31761 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31909 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3192 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31928 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31935 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer thermoplastischen Kunststoffolie und deren Verwendung als Puffermaterial | [1993/45] | English: | Method of producing thermoplastic resin film and cushioning material using same | [1993/45] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'une film polymère thermoplastiqué et matériau d'amortissement fabriqué à partir de celui-ci. | [1993/45] |
Former [1989/42] | Thermoplastische Kunststoffolie, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und diese verwendendes Puffermaterial | ||
Former [1989/42] | Thermoplastic resin film, method of producing same and cushioning material using same | ||
Former [1989/42] | Film polymère thermoplastique, procédé pour sa fabrication et matériau d'amortissement fabriqué à partir de celui-ci | Examination procedure | 19.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 10.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP55154127 ; | [A]GB1158140 (NAT DISTILLERS CHEM CORP [US]); | [A]US4314865 (OTTAVIANO GARY W); | [A]DE3229554 (HOECHST AG); | [X]EP0189270 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) | [X] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, June 1983, page 214, no. 23022; "Static mixing of laminar barrier polymer blends in multiple head equipment" | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 25 (M-55)[697], 14th February 1981; & JP-A-55 154 127 (TORAY K.K.) 01-12-1980, & JP55154127 A 00000000 |