EP0338723 - Novel compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Four New Horizons Court, Harlequin Avenue Brentford Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Four New Horizons Court Harlequin Avenue Brentford Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | ||
Former [1989/43] | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bromidge, Steven Mark Beecham Pharmaceuticals Coldharbour Road The Pinnacles Harlow Essex CM19 5AD / GB | 02 /
Hadley, Michael Stewart Beecham Pharmaceuticals Coldharbour Road The Pinnacles Harlow Essex CM19 5AD / GB | 03 /
Orlek, Barry Sidney Beecham Pharmaceuticals Coldharbour Road The Pinnacles Harlow Essex CM19 5AD / GB | [1989/43] | Representative(s) | Tocher, Pauline, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/43] | Tocher, Pauline, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303654.1 | 13.04.1989 | [1989/43] | Priority number, date | GB19880008925 | 15.04.1988 Original published format: GB 8808925 | GB19880012602 | 27.05.1988 Original published format: GB 8812602 | GB19880024076 | 13.10.1988 Original published format: GB 8824076 | [1989/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0338723 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0338723 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/08, C07D487/08, C07D453/02, A61K31/435, // (C07D471/08, 221:08, 209:00),(C07D487/08, 209:00, 209:00) | [1989/43] | CPC: |
C07D471/08 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (KR);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07D453/02 (EP,US);
C07D487/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/43] | Title | German: | Chemische Verbindungen | [1989/43] | English: | Novel compounds | [1989/43] | French: | Composés chimiques | [1989/43] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 04.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.1993 | ES | 04.08.1993 | GR | 04.08.1993 | SE | 04.08.1993 | LU | 30.04.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 04.08.1993 | |
GR | 04.08.1993 | ||
SE | 04.08.1993 | ||
LU | 30.04.1994 | ||
Former [1994/19] | AT | 04.08.1993 | |
SE | 04.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/16] | SE | 04.08.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0261763 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]); | [AP]EP0287356 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]); | [AD]EP0094742 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]); | [AD]EP0257741 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) |