EP0337814 - Thermoplastic resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.1996 [1996/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanada, Takashi 135, Iriyamazu Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-01 / JP | 02 /
Kitadono, Kaoru 1-9, Yushudainishi Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-01 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Yasurou 1-9, Yushudainishi Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-01 / JP | 04 /
Nishio, Taichi 2-14-34-3, Kurosuna Chiba-shi Chiba 281 / JP | 05 /
Abe, Hiroomi 251-75, Naganumacho Chiba-shi Chiba 281 / JP | 06 /
Kagawa, Noriyasu 1327-124, Kaizuka Chiba-shi Chiba 280 / JP | [1989/42] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303735.8 | 14.04.1989 | [1989/42] | Priority number, date | JP19880093221 | 14.04.1988 Original published format: JP 9322188 | [1989/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0337814 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0337814 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08L71/04, C08L77/00 | [1989/42] | CPC: |
C08K5/0008 (EP);
C08K5/35 (EP);
C08L71/123 (EP);
C08L77/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L71/123, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/42] | Title | German: | Thermoplastische Harzzusammensetzung | [1989/42] | English: | Thermoplastic resin composition | [1989/42] | French: | Composition de résines thermoplastiques | [1989/42] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 06.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/22] | 29.12.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1995 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0295103 ; | [X]EP0237187 ; | [A]EP0184151 ; | [A]EP0225170 |