Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3328889 | Global Dossier | 26.10.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9818788 | 22.04.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0338774 | Global Dossier | 10.10.1990 | A3 | EP0338774 | 25.10.1989 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP9818788 | 22.04.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1313929 | 02.03.1993 | C | Priority number | Date | JP9818788 | 22.04.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2219246 | 06.12.1989 | A | GB8908747D0 | 07.06.1989 | D0 | Priority number | Date | JP9818788 | 22.04.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2578637B | 05.02.1997 | B2 | JPH01269519 | 27.10.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9818788 | 22.04.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4902419 | 20.02.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9818788 | 22.04.1988 |