EP0338774 - Method for fastening soft porous tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.1992 [1992/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN GORE-TEX, INC. 42-5, 1-chome Akazutsumi Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/43] | For all designated states JAPAN GORE-TEX, INC. 42-5, 1-chome Akazutsumi Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibata, Yoshihiko 123, Minamigata Yoshinaga-Cho Wake-Gun Okayama-Ken 709-02 / JP | 02 /
Chikamori, Yoshihiro 123, Minamigata Yoshinaga-Cho Wake-Gun Okayama-Ken 709-02 / JP | 03 /
Shimizu, Yoichi 123, Minamigata Yoshinaga-Cho Wake-Gun Okayama-Ken 709-02 / JP | [1989/43] | Representative(s) | McCallum, William Potter, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | McCallum, William Potter, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1989/43] | Taylor, Derek George Mathisen, Macara & Co. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303826.5 | 18.04.1989 | [1989/43] | Priority number, date | JP19880098187 | 22.04.1988 Original published format: JP 9818788 | [1989/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0338774 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0338774 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/42, B01D63/06, B29C67/18, // B29L23:22, B29K105:04, B29L31:14 | [1990/41] | CPC: |
B01D63/061 (EP,US);
B29C57/00 (EP,US);
B29C65/48 (EP,US);
B29C66/02 (EP,US);
B29C66/112 (EP);
B29C66/114 (EP);
B29C66/53465 (EP,US);
B29C66/727 (EP,US);
B29C67/0044 (EP,US);
B29C70/845 (EP,US);
F28F21/062 (EP,US);
F28F9/162 (EP,US);
B29C65/54 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29K2105/04 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0065 (EP,US);
B29L2023/22 (EP,US);
B29L2031/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/139 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29C65/00 (US);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/18 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1989/43] | B29C65/54, B29C67/18, // B29L23:22, B29K105:04, B29L31:14 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Befestigen weicher, poröser Rohre | [1989/43] | English: | Method for fastening soft porous tubes | [1989/43] | French: | Procédé pour la fixation de tubes mous et poreux | [1989/43] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 06.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/30] | 20.02.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP6197005 ; | [A]JP61143124 ; | [A]JP59195095 ; | [Y]FR2399637 (FROEHLICH AIR AG [CH]); | [Y]EP0062086 (BAKKE IND LIMITED [ZA]); | [A]FR1280034 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE); | [A]GB2044909 (BIO ENERGY SYSTEMS INC); | [A]FR2584488 (CHAUSSON USINES SA [FR]); | [A]EP0086869 (RISSEN GMBH MASCHF [DE], et al); | [A]EP0166994 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]); | [A]FR2211270 (KALLE AG [DE]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 276 (C-373)[2332], 19th September 1986, page 58 C 373; & JP-A-61 97 005 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD) 15-05-1986, & JP6197005 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 339 (C-385)[2395], 15th November 1986, page 20 C 385; & JP-A³61 141 903 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD) 28-06-1986 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 342 (M-536)[2398], 19th November 1986; & JP-A-61 143 124 (JAPAN GOATETSUKUSU K.K.) 30-06-1986, & JP61143124 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 60 (M-364)[1783], 16th March 1985; & JP-A-59 195 095 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 06-11-1984, & JP59195095 A 00000000 |