EP0339855 - Electrodynamic loudspeaker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1996 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.1996 [1996/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inanaga, Kiyofumi c/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Sogawa, Hiroyuki c/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 03 /
Tsukamoto, Shiro c/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1989/44] | Representative(s) | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1989/44] | Thomas, Christopher Hugo, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303854.7 | 19.04.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | JP19880104596 | 27.04.1988 Original published format: JP 10459688 | JP19880120233 | 17.05.1988 Original published format: JP 12023388 | JP19880125387 | 23.05.1988 Original published format: JP 12538788 | [1989/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0339855 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0339855 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0339855 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/04, H04R9/02 | [1989/44] | CPC: |
H04R1/345 (EP,US);
H04R9/00 (KR);
H04R9/02 (EP,US);
H04R9/045 (EP,US);
H04R2209/043 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/44] | Title | German: | Elektrodynamischer Lautsprecher | [1989/44] | English: | Electrodynamic loudspeaker | [1989/44] | French: | Haut-parleur électrodynamique | [1989/44] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/38: Teilanmeldung 94103841.6 eingereicht am 19/04/89 | EPB 1995/38: Divisional application 94103841.6 filed on 19/04/89 | EPB 1995/38: Demande divisionnaire 94103841.6 déposée le 19/04/89 | Examination procedure | 08.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/40] | 07.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94103841.6 / EP0605400 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2492255 (ANGEHRN JOHN O); | [X]US2494918 (VOLKERS WALTER K); | [Y]GB803283 (BAERMANN MAX); | [A]DE3027586 (SENNHEISER ELECTRONIC [DE]); | [Y]US4653103 (MORI TOHRU [JP], et al) |