EP0344899 - Fixing bundle of elongate members or an elongate element having a non-cylindrical outer surface to a support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW United-Carr Ltd. Buckingham Road Aylesbury Buckinghamshire HP19 3QA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states TRW United-Carr Ltd. Buckingham Road Aylesbury Buckinghamshire HP19 3QA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barnett, Barry Roger Michael 20, Bedwyn Walk Aylesbury Buckinghamshire / GB | 02 /
Wiffin, Richard Eric 27 Lowman Way Aylesbury Buckinghamshire / GB | [1989/49] | Representative(s) | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303870.3 | 19.04.1989 | [1989/49] | Priority number, date | GB19880012183 | 23.05.1988 Original published format: GB 8812183 | [1989/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0344899 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0344899 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/22 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
F16L3/23 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53978 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53983 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, SE [1989/49] | Title | German: | Befestigung eines Bündels von länglichen Gegenständen oder eines nichtkreisförmigen länglichen Gegenstandes auf einer Unterlage | [1989/49] | English: | Fixing bundle of elongate members or an elongate element having a non-cylindrical outer surface to a support | [1989/49] | French: | Fixation d'une gerbe d'éléments allongés ou d'un élément allongé de surface non circulaire à un support | [1989/49] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/31: Teilanmeldung 91105544.0 eingereicht am 19/04/89 | EPB 1992/31: Divisional application 91105544.0 filed on 19/04/89 | EPB 1992/31: Demande divisionnaire 91105544.0 déposée le 19/04/89 | Examination procedure | 08.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/14] | 02.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP91105544.0 / EP0440270 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2168544 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | [XP]GB2207182 (FORD MOTOR CO); | [A]FR2407587 (WECHSLER BERNARD [FR]); | [A]FR2243360 (RAYMOND A STE [FR]) | Examination | EP0300712 |