EP0338835 - Scroll type compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.1994 [1994/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/43] | For all designated states SANDEN CORPORATION 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma, 372 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Kazuto 1-3-14 Hinode Honjo-shi Saitama, 367 / JP | [1989/43] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/43] | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303944.6 | 20.04.1989 | [1989/43] | Priority number, date | JP19880098393 | 22.04.1988 Original published format: JP 9839388 | [1989/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0338835 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0338835 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0338835 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/02, F04C27/00 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
F04C18/0215 (EP,US);
F04C27/005 (EP,US);
F04C23/008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/43] | F04C27/00, F04C18/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/43] | Title | German: | Spiralverdichter | [1989/43] | English: | Scroll type compressor | [1989/43] | French: | Compresseur du type à volutes | [1989/43] | Examination procedure | 12.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 19.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP60224987 ; | [A]JP60228787 ; | [A]JP60228788 ; | [A]JP62178789 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 83 (M-466)(2140) 02 April 1986, & JP-A-60 224987 (DAIKIN KOGYO K.K.) 09 November 1985,, & JP60224987 A 19851109 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 92 (M-468)(2149) 09 April 1986, & JP-A-60 228787 (DAIKIN KOGYO K.K.) 14 November 1985,, & JP60228787 A 19851114 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 92 (M-468)(2149) 09 April 1986, & JP-A-60 228788 (DAIKIN KOGYO K.K.) 14 November 1985,, & JP60228788 A 19851114 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 21 (M-661)(2868) 22 January 1988, & JP-A-62 178789 (HITACHI LTD) 05 August 1987,, & JP62178789 A 19870805 |