EP0339911 - Active noise control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, p.l.c. 1 Stanhope Gate London W1A 1EH / GB | [1989/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edwards, John William 33 Rochester Road Northwood Middlesex HA6 1NJ / GB | 02 /
Dekker, Nicolaas Martinus Johannes 97 Poplar Way Midhurst West Sussex, GU29 9JQ / GB | [1989/44] | Representative(s) | George, Sidney Arthur The General Electric Company p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | [1989/44] | Application number, filing date | 89304065.9 | 24.04.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | GB19880010236 | 29.04.1988 Original published format: GB 8810236 | [1989/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0339911 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0339911 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/16 | [1989/44] | CPC: |
G10K11/17853 (EP);
G10K11/178 (US);
G10K11/17819 (EP);
G10K11/17857 (EP);
G10K11/17881 (EP);
G10K2210/112 (EP,US);
G10K2210/3013 (EP,US);
G10K2210/3028 (EP,US);
G10K2210/3034 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/44] | Title | German: | Aktives Rauschbeeinflussungsgerät | [1989/44] | English: | Active noise control | [1989/44] | French: | Dispositif actif de réglage du bruit | [1989/44] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 09.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/24] | 06.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/12] | 20.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.05.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.05.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2187063 (GEN ELECTRIC PLC); | [A]WO8300580 (SOUND ATTENUATORS LTD [GB]); | [A]US4122303 (CHAPLIN GEORGE BRIAN BARRIE, et al); | [A]GB2154830 (NAT RES DEV) |