EP0394570 - An electro-optical device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iijima, Chiyoaki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken / JP | 02 /
Sato, Yuzuru c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken / JP | 03 /
Wada, Keiji c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken / JP | 04 /
Okumura, Osamu c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken / JP | 05 /
Kamata, Satoshi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken / JP | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Miller, Joseph, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | [1991/34] |
Former [1990/44] | Caro, William Egerton J. MILLER & CO. Lincoln House 296-302 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89304070.9 | 24.04.1989 | [1990/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0394570 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/133 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
G02F1/13471 (EP);
G02F1/1396 (EP);
G02F1/1397 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/44] | Title | German: | Elektro-optische Einrichtung | [1990/44] | English: | An electro-optical device | [1990/44] | French: | Dispositif électro-optique | [1990/44] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 07.07.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP62150329 ; | [XP]EP0320283 ; | [A]EP0246842 ; | [A]EP0022217 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 383 (P-646)[2830], 15th December 1987; & JP-A-62 150 329 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO. LTD) 04-07-1987, & JP62150329 A 00000000 |