EP0339916 - Video or other tape or film cassettes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHAPECOURT LIMITED 101 Sandford Road Birmingham B12 9BU / GB | [1989/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Raymond Leslie 6 Poplar Avenue West Bromwich West Midlands B70 6HP / GB | [1989/44] | Representative(s) | Spruce, George Philip, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2 JT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | Spruce, George Philip, et al George Fuery & Co. Whitehall Chambers 23 Colmore Row Birmingham B3 BL2 / GB | Application number, filing date | 89304080.8 | 19.04.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | GB19880009844 | 26.04.1988 Original published format: GB 8809844 | GB19880012284 | 24.05.1988 Original published format: GB 8812284 | GB19880015588 | 30.06.1988 Original published format: GB 8815588 | [1989/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0339916 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/087, G11B23/28 | [1989/44] | CPC: |
G11B23/287 (EP);
G11B23/08721 (EP);
G11B23/0875 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/44] | Title | German: | Kassetten für Videobänder oder andere Bänder oder Filme | [1989/44] | English: | Video or other tape or film cassettes | [1989/44] | French: | Cassettes à bande vidéo ou à autre bande ou film | [1989/44] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 01.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/19] | 06.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4702434 ; | [X]EP0064859 ; | [X]EP0054505 ; | [X]EP0120611 ; | [X]US4632335 ; | [XP]WO8803312 ; | [AP]EP0266983 ; | [A]WO8401657 ; | [A]WO8403791 ; | [A]WO8606536 |