EP0341032 - Method and apparatus for laying a filament [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.1990 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.02.1991 [1991/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STORK X-CEL B.V. Wim de Körverstraat 43a 5831 AN Boxmeer / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | For all designated states STORK X-CEL B.V. Wim de Körverstraat 43a NL-5831 AN Boxmeer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cave, Brian John 39 Harington Green Formby Merseyside, L37 1PN / GB | 02 /
Holmes, William Brian 77 Warren Drive Wallasey Merseyside, L45 0JP / GB | [1989/45] | Representative(s) | Huntingford, David Ian, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | Huntingford, David Ian, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 89304423.0 | 03.05.1989 | [1989/45] | Priority number, date | GB19880010564 | 05.05.1988 Original published format: GB 8810564 | [1989/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0341032 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0341032 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D04H3/04 | [1989/45] | CPC: |
D04H3/045 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1722 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ablegen eines Fadens | [1989/45] | English: | Method and apparatus for laying a filament | [1989/45] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour déposer un filament | [1989/45] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 20.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/37] | 10.12.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2174743 (ZBROJOVKA VSETIN NP [CS]); | [A]CH586298 (SAURER AG ADOLPH); | [A]EP0016356 (SOLVAY WERKE GMBH [DE]) |