EP0341892 - Recombinant DNA expression vectors and DNA compounds that encode deacetoxycephalosporin C synthetase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.1994 [1994/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ingolia, Thomas Dominick 99 West 73rd Street Indianapolis Indiana 46260 / US | 02 /
Kovacevic, Steven 5620 Broadway Indianapolis Indiana 46220 / US | 03 /
Miller, James Robert 9244 Thrushwood Lane Indianapolis Indiana 46250 / US | 04 /
Skatrud, Paul Luther 1045 Fiesta Drive Greenwood Indiana 46142 / US | [1989/46] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89304452.9 | 03.05.1989 | [1989/46] | Priority number, date | US19880192273 | 09.05.1988 Original published format: US 192273 | [1989/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0341892 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12N1/20, C12N1/14, // (C12N15/00, C12R1:19, 1:80, 1:82, 1:745, 1:465) | [1989/46] | CPC: |
C12N9/0071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/46] | Title | German: | Rekombinante DNS-Expressionsvektoren und DNS-Zusammensetzungen, die für Deacetoxycephalosporin C-Synthetase kodieren | [1989/46] | English: | Recombinant DNA expression vectors and DNA compounds that encode deacetoxycephalosporin C synthetase | [1989/46] | French: | Vecteurs recombinants d'expression d'ADN et composés d'ADN codant pour la déacétoxycéphalosporine C synthétase | [1989/46] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/46] | 31.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/15] | 15.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0233715 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) | [ ] - BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 5, no. 11, November 1987, pages 1207-1208,1211,1214, New York, US; S.M. SAMSON et al.: "Cloning and expression of the fungal expandase/hydroxylase gene involved in cephalosporin biosynthesis" | [ ] - JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, vol. 171, no. 2, February 1989, pages 754-760, Washington, DC, US; S. KOVACEVIC et al.: "Cloning, characterization, and expression in Escherichia coli of the Streptomyces clavuligerus gene encoding deacetoxycephalosporin C synthetase" |