EP0341893 - Hydroprocessing catalyst and method of preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA 1201 West 5th Street Los Angeles California 90017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA 1201 West 5th Street Los Angeles California 90017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simpson, Howard D. 3772 Hamilton Street Irvine Californa 92714 / US | 02 /
Borgens, Pauline B. 957 Dare Court Diamond Bar California 91765 / US | [1989/46] | Representative(s) | Jack, Bruce J., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | Jack, Bruce James, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89304459.4 | 03.05.1989 | [1989/46] | Priority number, date | US19880192379 | 10.05.1988 Original published format: US 192379 | [1989/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0341893 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0341893 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01J27/188, C10G49/04 | [1989/46] | CPC: |
B01J23/24 (EP,US);
B01J23/28 (EP,US);
B01J23/85 (EP,US);
B01J27/188 (EP,US);
B01J37/0203 (EP,US);
C10G45/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/46] | Title | German: | Wasserstoffumwandlungskatalysator und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1989/46] | English: | Hydroprocessing catalyst and method of preparation | [1989/46] | French: | Catalyseur d'hydrotraitement et méthode pour sa préparation | [1989/46] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/25] | 19.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 29.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/38] | 20.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/38] | Request for further processing for: | 19.03.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.05.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4446248 (SIMPSON HOWARD D [US], et al); | [A]US4455390 (TING PAULINE B [US], et al); | [Y]GB2131714 (NIPPON OIL CO LTD); | [AD]US4686030 (WARD JOHN W [US]) |