EP0341054 - Process for preparing inks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.1994 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION 222 Bridge Plaza South Fort Lee New Jersey 07026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | For all designated states SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION 222 Bridge Plaza South Fort Lee New Jersey 07026 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dien, Chi K. 41 Cornell Drive Livingston New Jersey / US | 02 /
Carlick, Daniel J. 13 Windsor Drive Livingston New Jersey / US | [1989/45] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89304485.9 | 04.05.1989 | [1989/45] | Priority number, date | US19880190569 | 05.05.1988 Original published format: US 190569 | [1989/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0341054 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0341054 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/02, C09B67/00 | [1989/45] | CPC: |
C09D11/08 (EP);
C09B67/0021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Tinte | [1989/45] | English: | Process for preparing inks | [1989/45] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'encre | [1989/45] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 01.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 03.03.1993 | LU | 31.05.1993 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2921238 (DEGUSSA); | [A]US4747882 (SCHWARTZ RUSSELL J [US], et al) |