blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0341071

EP0341071 - Detergent compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  27.09.2002
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2008Change - applicantpublished on 06.08.2008  [2008/32]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
Blackfriars
London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:CH  DE  ES  FR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars London
EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:CH  DE  ES  FR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Former [2002/46]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:CH  DE  ES  FR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Former [1993/09]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:CH  DE  ES  FR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Former [1989/45]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:CH  DE  ES  FR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Naik, Appaya Raghunath
8 Kilmalcolm Close Oxton
Birkenhead Merseyside, L43 9QT / GB
[1989/45]
Representative(s)Dekker, Enno Ernst Jan, et al
Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]Dekker, Enno E.J., et al
Unilever N.V. Patents Division P.O. Box 137
3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL
Former [1992/16]Elliott, Peter William, et al
Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Former [1991/05]Thomas, Susan Margaret
UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook
GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Former [1989/45]Green, Mark Charles
Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook
GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Application number, filing date89304522.905.05.1989
[1989/45]
Priority number, dateGB1988001082006.05.1988         Original published format: GB 8810820
[1989/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0341071
Date:08.11.1989
Language:EN
[1989/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0341071
Date:11.07.1990
Language:EN
[1990/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0341071
Date:03.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/31]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0341071
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.1990
ClassificationIPC:C11D1/83, C11D1/94, C11D3/32
[1989/45]
CPC:
C11D3/0094 (EP); C11D1/83 (EP); C11D1/94 (EP);
C11D3/32 (EP); C11D1/146 (EP); C11D1/22 (EP);
C11D1/662 (EP); C11D1/75 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1989/45]
TitleGerman:Waschmittelzusammensetzungen[1989/45]
English:Detergent compositions[1989/45]
French:Compositions détergentes[1989/45]
Examination procedure16.06.1990Examination requested  [1990/33]
21.05.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.12.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.12.1993Fee for grant paid
30.12.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.04.1995  24.04.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
TTP / Patentabteilung
D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  01.05.1995  06.06.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
van Gennip, Johannes Simeon W.
Vereenigde Postbus 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
 [N/P]
Former [1997/50]
Opponent(s)01  11.04.1995  24.04.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
TTP / Patentabteilung
D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  01.05.1995  06.06.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
van Gennip, Johannes Simeon Wilhelmus
Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97
NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL
Former [1995/25]
Opponent(s)01  11.04.1995  24.04.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
TTP / Patentabteilung
D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  01.05.1995  06.06.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10022 / US
Opponent's representative
Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas
KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street
London, WC1N 2DD / GB
Former [1995/23]
Opponent(s)01  11.04.1995  24.04.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
TTP / Patentabteilung
D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE
12.06.1995Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.11.1995Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.12.1997Date of oral proceedings
29.01.1998Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.01.1998Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.05.2002Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.07.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
10.09.2002Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition20.03.1998Appeal received No.  T0284/98
05.06.1998Statement of grounds filed
14.09.1999Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
27.03.1998Appeal received No.  T0284/98
27.04.1998Statement of grounds filed
07.05.2002Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
07.05.2002Date of oral proceedings
22.05.2002Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
22.05.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
16.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.06.199204   M06   Fee paid on   05.06.1992
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH31.05.1997
LI31.05.1997
SE06.05.2001
NL01.12.2001
[2002/20]
Former [1998/43]CH31.05.1997
LI31.05.1997
Documents cited:Search[X]US4668422  (MALIK ARSHAD H [US], et al);
 [XD]EP0070076  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]);
 [YD]EP0216301  (HENKEL KGAA);
 [A]EP0155737  (SHIONOGI & CO [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.