EP0343811 - Method and apparatus for testing thermal conductivity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZORTECH INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Hadzor Hall Hadzor Droitwich Worcestershire WR9 7DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | For all designated states ZORTECH INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Hadzor Hall Hadzor Droitwich Worcestershire WR9 7DJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hughes, John Thomas Arbour House 6 Cromwell Crescent Worcester WR5 2JW / GB | [1989/48] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town Claines Worcestershire WR3 7RY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates The Haven Plough Road Tibberton Droitwich Worcestershire WR9 7NQ / GB | ||
Former [1989/48] | Coker, David Graeme Micropore International Limited Hadzor Hall Hadzor Droitwich Worcestershire WR9 7DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89304735.7 | 10.05.1989 | [1989/48] | Priority number, date | GB19880012258 | 24.05.1988 Original published format: GB 8812258 | [1989/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0343811 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0343811 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0343811 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/18 | [1989/48] | CPC: |
G01N25/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Feststellung der Wärmeleitfähigkeit | [1989/48] | English: | Method and apparatus for testing thermal conductivity | [1989/48] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour déterminer la conductivité thermique | [1989/48] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 09.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5915846 ; | [A]JP56148045 | [A] - "TECHNOLOGY APPLICATIONS: PIPE INSULATION TESTER", 8th May 1980, no. 329/X, Union Carbide, Oak Ridge US | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 105 (P-274)[1542], 17th May 1984; & JP-A-59 15 846 (SHISAKA KENKYUSHO K.K.) 26-01-1984, & JP5915846 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 30 (P-103)[908], 23rd February 1982; & JP-A-56 148 045 (TEIJIN K.K.) 17-11-1981, & JP56148045 A 00000000 |