Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] |
02.09.1993 | First examination report | |
20.08.1991 | Publication of search report | published on 09.10.1991 [1991/41] |
24.01.1991 | Change - applicant | published on 13.03.1991 [1991/11] |
18.01.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.03.1991 [1991/10] |
30.09.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.11.1989 [1989/46] |