EP0343815 - Enamel frit composition for direct coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1997 [1997/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IKEBUKURO HORO KOGYO CO. LTD. 735, Ohaza Shimotomi Tokorozawa City Saitama Prefecture / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | For all designated states IKEBUKURO HORO KOGYO CO. LTD. 735, Ohaza Shimotomi Tokorozawa City Saitama Prefecture / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Tadao 5-32 Shibasaki-cho 4-chome Tachikawa City Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Iizawa, Yoshihiro 735 Ohaza Shimotomi Tokorozawa City Saitama Prefecture / JP | 03 /
Kasajima, Toshiyuki 735 Ohaza Shimotomi Tokorozawa City Saitama Prefecture / JP | [1996/10] |
Former [1989/48] | 01 /
Shimizu, Tadao 5-32 Shibasaki-cho 4-chome Tachikawa City Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Iizawa, Yoshihiro 735 Ohaza Shimotomi Tokorozawa City Saitama Prefecture / JP | |||
03 /
Kasajima, Toshiyuki 735 Ohaza Shimotomi Tokorosawa City Saitama Prefecture / JP | Representative(s) | Boff, James Charles, et al Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | Boff, James Charles, et al c/o Phillips & Leigh 7 Staple Inn Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | Application number, filing date | 89304819.9 | 12.05.1989 | [1989/48] | Priority number, date | JP19880127032 | 26.05.1988 Original published format: JP 12703288 | [1989/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0343815 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0343815 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0343815 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C03C8/02 | [1989/48] | CPC: |
C03C8/02 (EP,US);
C03C2207/04 (EP,US);
C03C2207/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/48] | Title | German: | Emailfrittenzusammensetzung zur direkten Beschichtung | [1989/48] | English: | Enamel frit composition for direct coating | [1989/48] | French: | Composition de fritte d'émail pour revêtement direct | [1989/48] | Examination procedure | 26.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 15.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1992 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 02.12.1992 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request granted | 07.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU405829 ; | [X]SU833617 ; | [X]SU399469 ; | [X]SU485083 ; | [X]SU535237 ; | [X]SU332060 ; | [X]US2829062 (BENNETT DWIGHT G, et al); | [X]US2397004 (HARBERT CARL J, et al) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 81, no. 18, 4th November 1974, page 331, abstract no. 110550j, Columbus, Ohio, US; & SU-A-405 829 (A.S. ES'KOV et al.) 05-11-1973, & SU405829 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 81, no. 26, 30th December 1974, page 365, abstract no. 175178p, Columbus, Ohio, US; SU-A-409 978 (A.S. ES'KOV et al.) 05-01-1974 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 20, 16th November 1981, page 309, abstract no. 174113r, Columbus, Ohio, US; & SU-A-833 617 (G.I. ARTAMONOVA et al.) 30-05-1981, & SU833617 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 81, no. 14, 7th October 1974, page 260, abstract no. 81737t, Columbus, Ohio, US; & SU-A-399 469 (SCIENTIFIC-RESEARCH AND DESIGN-TECHNOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF ENAMELED CHEMICAL EQUIPMENT) 03-10-1973, & SU399469 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 84, no. 2, 12th January 1976, page 224, abstract no. 8345w, Columbus, Ohio, US; & SU-A-485 083 (ORDZHONIKIDZE S., POLYTECHNIC INSTITUTE, NOVOCHERKASSK) 25-09-1975, & SU485083 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 94, no. 4, January 1981, page 245, abstract no. 19497e, Columbus, Ohio, US; V.V. BALANDINA et al.: "Use of cerium dioxide and neodymium oxide obtained from nonferrous metallurgy wastes in the synthesis of easily fusible glazes", & IZV. SEV.-KAUK. NAUCHN. TSENTRA VYSSH. SHK., TEKH. NAUKI 1980, (1), 23-5 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 86, no. 10, 7th March 1977, page 287, abstract no. 59511w, Columbus, Ohio, US; & SU-A-535 237 (V.I. BYSTROVA et al.) 15-11-1976, & SU535237 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 77, no. 14, 2nd October 1972, page 267, abstract no. 92253a, Columbus, Ohio, US; & SU-A-332 060 (S.S. SOLNTSEV et al.) 14-03-1972, & SU332060 A 00000000 |