EP0342876 - Waste treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY INTEROX LIMITED Baronet Works, Baronet Road Warrington, Cheshire WA4 6HB / GB | [1992/47] |
Former [1989/47] | For all designated states Interox Chemicals Limited 3 Bedford Square London WC1B 3RA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rowbotton, Kenneth Thomas 11 Redwood Close Woolston Warrington Cheshire W41 4EH / GB | 02 /
Wilkinson, John Nicholas Ralph 12 Dale Crescent Congleton Cheshire CW12 3ER / GB | 03 /
Conboy, Terence Michael 6 Locking Stumps Lane Birchwood Warrington Cheshire, WA3 7LZ / GB | 04 /
Hutson, Graham Victor 3 Denton Park, Gosforth Seascale Cumbria, CA20 1 BG / GB | [1995/25] |
Former [1989/47] | 01 /
Rowbotton, Kenneth Thomas 11 Redwood Close Woolston Warrington Cheshire W41 4EH / GB | ||
02 /
Wilkinson, John Nicholas Ralph 12 Dale Crescent Congleton Cheshire CW12 3ER / GB | |||
03 /
Conboy, Terence Michael 6 Locking Stumps Lane Biechwood Warrington Cheshire, WA3 7LZ / GB | |||
04 /
Hutson, Graham Victor 3 Denton Park, Gosforth Seascale Cumbria, CA20 1 BG / GB | Representative(s) | Pearce, Timothy, et al Solvay Interox Limited Patent Department PO Box 51 Moorfield Road Widnes Cheshire WA8 0HE / GB | [2008/28] |
Former [1992/47] | Pearce, Timothy, et al Solvay Interox Limited Patent Department P.O. Box 51 Moorfield Road Widnes Cheshire WA8 0FE / GB | ||
Former [1989/47] | Pearce, Timothy Solvay Interox Limited Patent Department P.O. Box 51 Moorfield Road Widnes Cheshire WA8 0FE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89304837.1 | 12.05.1989 | [1989/47] | Priority number, date | GB19880011784 | 18.05.1988 Original published format: GB 8811784 | [1989/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0342876 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0342876 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0342876 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/06 | [1989/47] | CPC: |
A62D3/38 (EP,US);
G21F9/06 (EP,US);
A62D2101/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1989/47] | Title | German: | Behandlung von Abfällen | [1989/47] | English: | Waste treatment | [1989/47] | French: | Traitement de déchets | [1989/47] | Examination procedure | 13.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/41] | 22.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP62129799 ; | [YD]JPS59184898 (NIPPON ATOMIC IND GROUP CO, et al); | [AD]JPS6061697 (NIPPON ATOMIC IND GROUP CO, et al); | [A]FR2558293 (JAPAN ATOMIC ENERGY RES INST [JP]) | [Y] - WORLD PATENT INDEX (LATEST), Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-62 129 799 (TOSHIBA K.K.), & JP62129799 A 00000000 |