EP0343830 - Ring-substituted 2-amino-1,2,3,4-tetrahydronaphthalenes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.1995 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nixon, James Arthur 7375 Taos Trail Indianapolis Indiana 46219 / US | 02 /
Pioch, Richard Paul 3750 Briarwood Drive Indianapolis Indiana 46240 / US | 03 /
Schaus, John Mehnert 5427 Noth Delaware Street Indianapolis Indiana 46220 / US | 04 /
Titus, Robert Daniel 3639 Country Walk Circle Indianapolis Indiana 46227 / US | [1989/48] | Representative(s) | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89304935.3 | 16.05.1989 | [1989/48] | Priority number, date | US19880197236 | 23.05.1988 Original published format: US 197236 | [1989/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0343830 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0343830 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0343830 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/02, C07D295/06, C07D295/08, C07D295/10, C07D295/14, C07D243/08, A61K31/495, A61K31/55 | [1989/48] | CPC: |
C07D295/155 (EP);
C07D241/04 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D243/04 (KR);
C07D243/08 (EP);
C07D295/033 (EP);
C07D295/073 (EP);
C07D295/096 (EP);
C07D295/112 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/48] | Title | German: | Ringsubstituierte 2-Amin-1,2,3,4-tetrahydro-naphthaline | [1989/48] | English: | Ring-substituted 2-amino-1,2,3,4-tetrahydronaphthalenes | [1989/48] | French: | 2-Amino-1,2,3,4-tétrahydronaphthalènes substitués dans l'anneau | [1989/48] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/48] | 26.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.07.1994 | GR | 13.07.1994 | NL | 13.07.1994 | SE | 13.07.1994 | [2000/04] |
Former [1995/49] | AT | 13.07.1994 | |
NL | 13.07.1994 | ||
SE | 13.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 13.07.1994 | |
NL | 13.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 13.07.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0000395 (SANDOZ AG [CH]); | [A]GB2067562 (DELALANDE SA); | [AP]EP0270947 (BAYER AG [DE]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 18, 1975, pages 362-367, Washington, US; J.D. McDERMED et al.: "Synthesis and pharmacology of some 2-aminotetralins. Dopamine receptor agonists" | Examination | - Dopamine receptor agonists" | - Eisenbraun et al J. Org Chem. 1970 Vol 35 pp1265-1271 |