EP0343846 - Process for the preparation of polycrystalline diamond [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 09.10.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jansen, Frank 301 Maidstone Drive Webster New York 14580 / US | 02 /
Machonkin, Mary Ann 816 Ivy Court Webster New York 14580 / US | [1989/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/24] | Reynolds, Julian David, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1989/48] | Hill, Cecilia Ann Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305015.3 | 18.05.1989 | [1989/48] | Priority number, date | US19880199646 | 27.05.1988 Original published format: US 199646 | [1989/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0343846 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0343846 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0343846 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/02, C23C16/26, C30B29/04 | [1989/48] | CPC: |
H01L21/4803 (EP,US);
C23C16/0272 (EP,US);
C23C16/27 (EP,US);
C30B25/02 (EP,US);
C30B29/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C30B25/02, C30B29/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von polykristallinem Diamant | [1996/49] | English: | Process for the preparation of polycrystalline diamond | [1989/48] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de diamant polycristallin | [1989/48] |
Former [1989/48] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polykristallinem Diamant | Examination procedure | 09.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/23] | 21.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.01.1996 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.09.1997
ADMISSIBLE SUMITOMO ELECTRIC Industries Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku JP - 541 Osaka / JP Opponent's representative Hansen, Bernd, et al, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [1997/44] | 30.10.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.01.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.06.1998 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 06.07.1998 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1998/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.12.1996 | DE | 05.03.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [1997/44] | DE | 05.03.1997 | |
FR | 30.04.1997 | ||
Former [1997/29] | DE | 05.03.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JP62138395 ; | [A]JP62226889 ; | [XP]JP01024092 ; | [XP]JP01061397 ; | [E]JP1242490 | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 365 (C-460)[2812], 27th November 1987; & JP-A-62 138 395 (KYOCERA CORP.) 22-06-1987, & JP62138395 A 00000000 | [X] - INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF REFRACTORY AND HARD METALS, vol. 7, no. 2, June 1988, pages 92-107, Shrewsbury, GB; P.-O. JOFFREAU et al.: "Low-pressure diamond growth on high-pressure diamond crystals pressed onto different substrates" | [AD] - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 63, no. 5, 1st March 1988, pages 1744-1748, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; C.-P. CHANG et al.: "Diamond crystal growth by plasma chemical vapor deposition" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 92 (C-483)[2939], 25th March 1988; & JP-A-62 226 889 (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO., LTD) 05-10-1987, & JP62226889 A 00000000 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 205 (C-595)[3553], 15th May 1989; & JP-A-01 024 092 (SHOWA DENKO K.K.) 26-01-1989, & JP01024092 A 00000000 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 260 (C-607)[3608], 15th June 1989; & JP-A-01 061 397 (ASAHI DAIYAMONDO KOGYO K.K.) 08-03-1989, & JP01061397 A 00000000 | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 579 (C-668)[3927], 20th December 1989; & JP-A-1 242 490 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP.) 27-09-1989, & JP1242490 A 00000000 | Examination | - crystal growth by plasma chemical vapor deposition" |