EP0344950 - Method for determining oil content of an underground formation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 2000 Westchester Avenue White Plains New York 10650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 2000 Westchester Avenue White Plains, New York 10650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Supernaw, Irwin Ray 5815 Arncliffe Drive Houston Texas 77088 / US | [1989/49] | Representative(s) | Green, Mark Charles, et al Murgitroyd & Company London Euston House 24 Eversholt Street London NW1 1AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Green, Mark Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1989/49] | Wood, Anthony Charles Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305070.8 | 18.05.1989 | [1989/49] | Priority number, date | US19880201729 | 03.06.1988 Original published format: US 201729 | US19890307118 | 03.02.1989 Original published format: US 307118 | [1989/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0344950 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0344950 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01N33/24 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
G01N33/241 (EP,US);
G01N21/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Ölgehaltes in einer unterirdischen Formation | [1989/49] | English: | Method for determining oil content of an underground formation | [1989/49] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer la teneur de pétrole dans une formation souterraine | [1989/49] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 31.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 10.12.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/11] | Appeal following examination | 17.01.1994 | Appeal received No. T0188/94 | 23.02.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.01.1995 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU819647 ; | [YD]US2311151 (CAMPBELL JOHN G); | [YD]US4609821 (SUMMERS CHARLES F [GB]) | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, week E03, 3rd March 1982, accession no. 05518E/03, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & SU-A-819 647 (GEOLOG SURVEY OIL) 17-04-1981, & SU819647 A 00000000 |