blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0343944

EP0343944 - Process for making 1,3-diols from epoxides [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.06.1993
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.06.1993Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.07.1993 [1993/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST CELANESE CORPORATION
Route 202-206 North
Somerville, N.J. 08876 / US
[1989/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Murphy, Mark Alan
3126 Dunbarton Oak
Corpus Christi Texas / US
[1989/48]
Representative(s)De Minvielle-Devaux, Ian Benedict Peter, et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
[1989/48]
Application number, filing date89305230.824.05.1989
[1989/48]
Priority number, dateUS1988019836425.05.1988         Original published format: US 198364
[1989/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0343944
Date:29.11.1989
Language:EN
[1989/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0343944
Date:09.05.1990
Language:EN
[1990/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.1990
ClassificationIPC:C07C29/36, C07C31/20, C07C35/14
[1989/48]
CPC:
C07C29/36 (EP,US); C07C31/20 (KR)
C-Set:
C07C29/36, C07C31/205 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/48]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung 1,3-Diolen aus Epoxiden[1989/48]
English:Process for making 1,3-diols from epoxides[1989/48]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication de diols-1,2 à partir d'époxides[1989/48]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure16.10.1990Examination requested  [1990/50]
20.05.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.1993Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1993/29]
19.02.1993Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1993/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP57128645  ;
 [Y]DE2531131  (UNION CARBIDE CORP);
 [Y]EP0257967  (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.