EP0344965 - Apparatus and methods for bubble and other thin film constructions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 02.10.1991 [1991/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thiokol Corporation 2475 Washington Boulevard Ogden, Utah 84401-2398 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states THIOKOL CORPORATION 2475 Washington Boulevard Ogden, Utah 84401-2398 / US | ||
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states MORTON THIOKOL, INC. 110 North Wacker Drive Chicago Illinois 60606-1560 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moore, Gilbert R. 269 E. 3050 N. North Ogden Utah 84414 / US | [1989/49] | Representative(s) | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305266.2 | 24.05.1989 | [1989/49] | Priority number, date | US19880200601 | 31.05.1988 Original published format: US 200601 | [1989/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0344965 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/49] | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/00, B29C47/22, B29D22/00, B29D25/00, B64G1/44 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
B29C49/0042 (EP,US);
B64G99/00 (EP,US);
B29D25/00 (EP,US);
B29C48/0018 (EP,US);
B29C48/0019 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für blasenförmige und andere dünnschichtige Konstruktionen | [1989/49] | English: | Apparatus and methods for bubble and other thin film constructions | [1989/49] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de bulles et d'éléments à fines parois | [1989/49] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.07.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |