EP0348044 - Lube oil solvent dewaxing control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.1993 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE | published on 06.10.1993 [1993/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 2000 Westchester Avenue White Plains New York 10650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 2000 Westchester Avenue White Plains, New York 10650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harrison, Charles Wesley 12158 Huntington Park Houston Texas 77099 / US | 02 /
Gerondale, Michael Joseph 12815 North 49th Avenue Gendale Arizona 85304 / US | 03 /
Patrone, Anthony Joseph 1601 Poole Avenue, No. 618 Port Arthur Texas 77642 / US | 04 /
Yang Ong, James Ow 11315 Briar Rose Houston Texas 77077 / US | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305288.6 | 25.05.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | US19880209123 | 20.06.1988 Original published format: US 209123 | [1989/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0348044 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0348044 | Date: | 21.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0348044 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C10G73/34 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
C10G73/34 (EP,US);
Y10S208/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [1989/52] | Title | German: | Kontrollanlage für das Entparaffinieren von Schmierölen mit Lösungsmitteln | [1989/52] | English: | Lube oil solvent dewaxing control system | [1989/52] | French: | Système de contrôle du déparaffinage d'huiles lubrifiantes avec de solvant | [1989/52] | Examination procedure | 21.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/16] | 18.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [1993/40] |
Former [1993/28] | DE | 23.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3972779 (HARRISON CHARLES W); | [A]US4262790 (CASTIGLIONE ALFONSO); | [A]US3549514 (BROWN WILLIAM F, et al); | [AD]US3764517 (BODEMULLER R) | Examination | US4354921 |