EP0344000 - Ferroelectric ceramic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ushida, Yoshihisa Mitsui Petrochemical Ind., Ltd. 3 Chigusa-Kaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | 02 /
Hirai, Nobuki Mitsui Petrochemical Ind., Ltd. 3 Chigusa-Kaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | 03 /
Mase, Hiroshi Mitsui Petrochemical Ind., Ltd. 3 Chigusa-Kaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | [1989/48] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1989/48] | Myerscough, Philip Boyd J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305333.0 | 25.05.1989 | [1989/48] | Priority number, date | JP19880129799 | 27.05.1988 Original published format: JP 12979988 | JP19880129800 | 27.05.1988 Original published format: JP 12980088 | [1989/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0344000 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0344000 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0344000 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/49, C04B35/00 | [1991/12] | CPC: |
C04B35/493 (EP,KR,US);
H10N30/853 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/48] | C04B35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/48] | Title | German: | Ferroelektrisches keramisches Material | [1989/48] | English: | Ferroelectric ceramic material | [1989/48] | French: | Matériau céramique ferroélectrique | [1989/48] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/45] | 13.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 23.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/29] | Request for further processing for: | 22.12.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.01.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.1995 | BE | 26.07.1995 | ES | 26.07.1995 | GR | 26.07.1995 | SE | 26.10.1995 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 26.07.1995 | |
BE | 26.07.1995 | ||
GR | 26.07.1995 | ||
SE | 26.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | AT | 26.07.1995 | |
BE | 26.07.1995 | ||
SE | 26.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 26.07.1995 | |
SE | 26.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/11] | SE | 26.10.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1604356 ; | [A]US3956150 (OUCHI HIROMU, et al) |