EP0345037 - A digital signal recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.1995 [1995/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eguchi, Takeo c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/49] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305473.4 | 31.05.1989 | [1989/49] | Priority number, date | JP19880133922 | 31.05.1988 Original published format: JP 13392288 | [1989/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0345037 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0345037 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0345037 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10, G11B20/14, G11B5/024, G11B27/036, G11B5/09, G11B5/008 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
G11B15/125 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (EP,KR,US);
G11B20/1419 (EP,US);
G11B27/036 (EP,US);
G11B5/024 (EP,US);
G11B5/09 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1989/49] | G11B5/09, G11B20/10, G11B5/008 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/49] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Aufnahme von digitalen Signalen | [1989/49] | English: | A digital signal recording apparatus | [1989/49] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement de signaux digitaux | [1989/49] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/32] | 14.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP59036312 ; | [A]JP60076005 ; | [AP]US4779146 (CHUMA AKIRA [JP], et al); | [A]EP0185764 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]); | [A]FR2322484 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 133 (P-281)(1570) 20 June 1984, & JP-A-59 036 312 (SONY K.K.) 28 February 1984, & JP59036312 A 19840228 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 217 (P-385) 4 September 1985, & JP-A-60 076 005 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) 30 April 1985, & JP60076005 A 19850430 |