EP0355952 - Optical communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.1992 [1992/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STC PLC 10, Maltravers Street London, WC2R 3HA / GB | [1990/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McEwen, Colin Dougal 4, Wentworth Drive Bishop's Stortford, Herts CM23 2PB / GB | [1990/09] | Application number, filing date | 89305502.0 | 01.06.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | GB19880020076 | 24.08.1988 Original published format: GB 8820076 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0355952 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0355952 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/10 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
H04B10/1149 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Optisches Übertragungssystem | [1990/09] | English: | Optical communication system | [1990/09] | French: | Système de communication optique | [1990/09] | File destroyed: | 22.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 02.01.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/26] | 28.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4727600 ; | [X]JPS6292531 ; | [Y]JPS59133744 ; | [A]JPS60180230 ; | [A]JPS62109438 ; | [A]JPS60227530 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 294 (E-544)[2741]22nd September 1987; & JP-A-62 092 531 (NEC) 28-04-1987 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 261 (E-281)[1698]30th November 1984; & JP-A-59 133 744 (NIPPON DENKI) 01-08-1984 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol.10, no. 20 (E-376)[2077]25th January 1986; & JP-A-60 180 230 (FUJITSU) 14-09-1985 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 320 (E-550)[2767]17th Oktober 1987; & JP-A-62 109 438 (MATSUSHITA) 20-05-1987 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 82 (E-392)[2139]2nd April 1986; & JP-A-60 227 530 (MITSUBISHI) 12-11-1985 |