EP0346015 - Optical system for detecting three-dimensional shape [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.1995 [1995/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kakinoki, Yoshikazu Asahi-so 106 18-22, Asahi-cho 1-chome Machida-shi Tokyo 194 / JP | 02 /
Nakashima, Masato 33-18, Mitakedai Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227 / JP | 03 /
Koezuka, Tetsuo 25-16, Mejirodai 3-chome Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193 / JP | 04 /
Hiraoka, Noriyuki Senchuri II 205, 286, Miyazaki Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213 / JP | 05 /
Tsukahara, Hiroyuki Mezon Seiko-so A-3 12-14, Sakae-cho 1-chome Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243 / JP | 06 /
Suto, Yoshinori Fujitsu Meiwa-ryo 102 30, Shimokodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | 07 /
Oshima, Yoshitaka Fujitsu Atsugi-ryo 3-10, Sakae-cho 2-chome Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243 / JP | 08 /
Hashinami, Shinji Fujitsu Atsugi-ryo 3-10, Sakae-cho 2-chome Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243 / JP | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305573.1 | 02.06.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | JP19880136651 | 04.06.1988 Original published format: JP 13665188 | JP19880144846 | 14.06.1988 Original published format: JP 14484688 | JP19880196815 | 05.08.1988 Original published format: JP 19681588 | JP19880218165 | 31.08.1988 Original published format: JP 21816588 | [1989/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0346015 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0346015 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0346015 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/24 | [1989/50] | CPC: |
G01B11/24 (EP,KR,US);
H05K13/0815 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/50] | Title | German: | Optisches System zur Ermittlung einer dreidimensionalen Form | [1989/50] | English: | Optical system for detecting three-dimensional shape | [1989/50] | French: | Système optique pour déterminer une forme tridimensionnelle | [1989/50] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 08.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP63079004 ; | [A]JP60082804 ; | [A]JP61225606 ; | [A]JP59206706 ; | [A]JP57207807 ; | [Y]US4627734 (RIOUX MARC [CA]); | [A]US4171917 (PIRLET ROBERT A [BE]); | [A]GB2041690 (SCHLATTER AG); | [A]EP0134597 (OPTISCHE IND DE OUDE DELFT NV [NL]) | [Y] - OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 24, no. 6, November/December 1985, pages 978-980, Society of Photo-Optical Instrumentation Engineers, Bellingham, Washington, US; G. HÄUSLER et al.: "Telecentric scanner for 3-D sensing" | [Y] - 8TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, Paris, 27th - 31st October 1986, pages 220-225, IEEE, New York, US; N. IDESAWA: "3-D Model reconstruction and processing for CAE" | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 309 (P-748), 23rd August 1988; & JP-A-63 079 004 (MITSUTOYO CORP.) 09-04-1988, & JP63079004 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 224 (P-387)[1947], 10th September 1985; & JP-A-60 082 804 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU K.K.) 11-05-1985, & JP60082804 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 62 (P-551)[2509], 25th February 1987; & JP-A-61 225 606 (SUMITOMO METAL IND. LTD) 07-10-1986, & JP61225606 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 76 (P-346)[1799], 5th April 1985; & JP-A-59 206 706 (YOUJI WADA) 22-11-1984, & JP59206706 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 60 (P-182)[1205], 12th March 1983; & JP-A-57 207 807 (FUJITSU K.K.) 20-12-1982, & JP57207807 A 00000000 |